CA SB110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26211, 26212, 26213, 26214, 26215, 26216, 26217, 26227, 26233, and 26240 of, and to add Sections 26205.5 and 26227.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Clean Energy Job Creation Program and citizen oversight board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB110 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SB 110 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB110 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SB 110 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB110 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1715.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 2250.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1038.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |