CA SB1103 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69433.2 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Cal Grant Program: annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1103 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1103 Wright (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1103 Wright (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3472.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3231.) (April 18). | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing March 21. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51229 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69433.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |