CA SB1103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 980 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans’ benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |