CA SB1103 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 827, 1632, and 1946.1 of, and to add Section 1950.9 to, the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy of commercial real properties: agreements: building operating costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1103 Menjivar (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1103 Menjivar (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4082.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3820.) (April 30). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1946.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1950.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |