CA SB1105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69433 of the Education Code, relating to voter registration.
Title
Voter registration: Cal Grant Program application.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69433 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1105&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1105_bill_20140219_introduced.html |