CA SB1105 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25503.6 and 25503.8 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 23550) to Chapter 3 of Division 9 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licensees: sports entertainment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1105 Mendoza Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1105 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1105 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5961.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3493.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23792 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |