CA SB111 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22950.6 and 22955.1 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 19827, 19849, 19851, 20825.1, and 20825.2 of, and to add Section 20825.12 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 11873 of the Insurance Code, relating to public employment and retirement, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public employment and retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB111 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 2611.) |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 674.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22950.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22955.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20825.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20825.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20825.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |