CA SB1112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13146.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection services.
Title
Fire protection: school inspection: fire alarm systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3339.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13146.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |