CA SB116 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by amending Item 9100-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB116 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB116 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 0.) (March 5). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 26. Noes 1.) (September 14). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1040.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5064 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15570.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15570.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15618.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15672 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15674 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15676 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15676.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15677 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15679.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18874 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 20.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |