CA SB117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4005 of, to add Section 4005.5. to, to repeal Section 11105 of, and to repeal and add Sections 11104, 11106, 11108, and 11324 of, the Elections Code, and to repeal Section 93 of Chapter 28 of the Statutes of 2017, relating to elections, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB117 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 117 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 117 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Motion to Re-refer to Committee By HARPER (Y: 26 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB117 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 117 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 117 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Motion to Re-refer to Committee By HARPER (Y: 26 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB117 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 49. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2746.) |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 11.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1040.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11105 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005.5. | New Code | See Bill Text |