CA SB1170 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 7530 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Private Investigator Act: license: assignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1170 Morrell Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7530 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |