CA SB1174 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 75128.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: general plan: Future Sustainable Communities
Sponsors
Sen. Curren Price [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1174 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1174 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3738.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3498.) | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3307.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-15 | Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.) | |
2010-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (April 13 amended version corrected April 20.) | |
2010-03-09 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |