CA SB1180 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1371.51 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10126.61 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.13 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1180 Ashby (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1180 Ashby (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4092.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3974.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3755.) (April 24). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1371.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10126.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |