CA SB119 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1502 of, and to add Sections 1502.35 and 1530.85 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to community care facilities.
Title
Emergency youth shelter facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB119 Lowenthal (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB119 Lowenthal (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1112.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-03-16 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-01-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1502.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1530.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |