CA SB119 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4216, 4216.1, 4216.2, 4216.3, 4216.4, 4216.5, 4216.6, 4216.7, 4216.8, and 4216.9 of, and to add Sections 4216.12, 4216.13, 4216.14, 4216.15, 4216.16, 4216.17, 4216.18, 4216.19, 4216.20, 4216.21, and 4216.22 to, the Government Code, to add Sections 17921.11 and 18940.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 955.5 and 1702.5 of, and to add Sections 320.5, 911.2, and 971 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to excavations.
Title
Protection of subsurface installations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB119 Hill Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 119 Hill Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB119 Hill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 119 Hill Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB119 Hill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-10 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-10 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28). |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 817.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 591.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., G.O., and JUD. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |