CA SB1194 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33133.3 to the Education Code, relating to elementary and secondary education.
Title
Advisory bodies: membership information: State Superintendent of Public Instruction’s Parent Advisory Council: meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Wilk (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Wilk (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4138.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator Wiener. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33133.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |