CA SB1213 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 104150 and 104162 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care programs.
Title
Health care programs: cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1213 Atkins et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1213 Atkins et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3975.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3469.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |