CA SB122 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 526.1 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 525 and 526 of, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to vessels.
Title
Vessels: abandonment: abatement.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - SB 122 Lieu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB122 Lieu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB122 Lieu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 525 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 526 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 526.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |