CA SB122 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21082.1, 21091, 21159.9, and 21167.6 of, and to add Section 21167.6.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: record of proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB122 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 122 Jackson Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB122 Jackson (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 122 Jackson Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB122 Jackson (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5372.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 6098.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 648.) (April 15). |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21082.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21159.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21167.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21167.6.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |