CA SB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75230 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 99268.9, 99312.1, and 99314.6 of, and to add Section 99314.10 to, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 6592 of, and to add Sections 6452.05 and 6591.3 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB122 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 678.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 75230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99268.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99312.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6452.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6591.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6592 | Amended Code | Citation Text |