CA SB1221 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3960 of, to add Sections 3032, 3960.2, 3960.4, and 3960.6 to, and to repeal Section 4756 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to mammals.
Title
Mammals: use of dogs to pursue bears and bobcats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1221 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1221 Lieu Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1221 Lieu (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Place on Appropriations suspense file refused (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1221 Lieu Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1221 Lieu (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Place on Appropriations suspense file refused (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4874.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-22 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-05-21 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 3557.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (May 7). | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3265.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3960 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3960.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3960.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3960.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4756 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |