CA SB123 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53086 of the Education Code, relating to career development.
Title
California Career Resource Network Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-09 - Assembly - SB 123 Liu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB123 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB123 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-07-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-07-09 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2449.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-06 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-02 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |
2009-05-11 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-22 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 309.) | |
2009-03-09 | Set for hearing March 18. | |
2009-03-03 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Set for hearing March 11. | |
2009-02-23 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-05 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | |
2009-02-04 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |