CA SB1249 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 350 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Counterfeit marks: donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1249 Ducheny (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-06-22 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and J.,E.D., & E. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3746.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3674.) | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3181.) | |
2010-04-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-16 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |