CA SB1249 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 42127.01 of the Education Code, relating to school finance.
Title
School finance: school districts: annual budgets: reserve balance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3607.) Reconsideration granted. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B. & F.R. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42127.01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |