CA SB1249 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 4456.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicle dealers: document processing charge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1249 Archuleta (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3902.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3521.) (April 26). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 4456.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |