CA SB125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 2950) to Chapter 13 of Division 3 of the Fish and Game Code, to add and repeal Section 15570.32 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 2207 and 3823 of the Public Resources Code, and to add Part 25 (commencing with Section 47000) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: geothermal resources: lithium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 125 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB125 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB125 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB125 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB125 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:10 a.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4541.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 5605.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5550.) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15570.32 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 2207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3823 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 47000 | New Code | See Bill Text |