CA SB1254 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116681 and 116686 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: administrator: managerial and other services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1254 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1254 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1254 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1254 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1254 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5829.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3842.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3514.) (April 26). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3239.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116686 | Amended Code | Citation Text |