CA SB1271 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13651 and 13656 of the Probate Code, relating to summary probate procedures.
Title
Summary probate procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 13651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13656 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1271&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1271_bill_20160218_introduced.html |