CA SB1279 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14525.3 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
California Transportation Commission: funding prohibition: coal shipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1279 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1279 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1279 Hancock (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1279 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1279 Hancock (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5375.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6019.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3). |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4124.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4007.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3617.) (April 19). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | April 12 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14525.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |