CA SB1290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51223.3 to the Education Code, relating to physical education.
Title
Physical education: self-defense and safety instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1290 Kehoe (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1290 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1290 Kehoe (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1290 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1290 Kehoe (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4900.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6508.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-06-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-24 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 3586.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.) | |
2010-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-08 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-03-24 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (March 23 amended version corrected March 25.) | |
2010-03-18 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-09 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |