CA SB1290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 51039.9 of the Government Code, relating to sidewalk vendors.
Title
Sidewalk vendors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1290 Allen (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1290 Allen (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 4. Page 3916.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3790.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3608.) (May 4). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH, PUB. S., and GOV. & F. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51039.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |