CA SB1304 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 494.6, 2135.7, 2507, 2530.2, 2660, 3010.5, 3110, 4342, 8776, 18646, 19605.73, 22251.2, and 23826.12 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 56.30, 1102.6, and 1788.58 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 425.16, 580b, 580d, 1282.4, and 1530 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 402.5, 14001, and 14305 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 221.5, 2576, 8151, 8152, 8155, 8482.3, 20092, 32282.1, 35182.5, 41329.575, 42238.03, 42283, 44212, 44956, 49085, 49557.2, 60643, 60811.4, 66746, 66762.5, 78230, 92493, and 99301 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 2187, 3007.8, 5001, 19284, and 19290 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 914, 6383, and 8730 of the Family Code, to amend Section 12002 of, and to repeal Section 8664.2 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 24001, 24011, 24012, 43003, 47060, 47061, and 81006 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 905.2, 1043, 1097.1, 9402, 11507, 6588.7, 12011.5, 12012.61, 13403, 13978.8, 14528.56, 15920, 41805, 53313, 57118, and 70377 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1275.3, 1357.51, 1367.006, 1375.9, 1562.3, 1796.24, 11379, 11751, 25249.7, 25269.1, 121022, 121026, 123367, and 130301 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 395, 791.29, 935.8, 1216.1, 10133.4, 10232.8, 10234.93, 10753.05, 10961, and 10965.11 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 139.2, 139.5, 230.4, 1773.1, 2055, 4600, and 5502 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 935 and 952 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 136.2, 145.5, 273.5, 289.6, 311.11, 311.12, 326.3, 487a, 519, 646.91, 647, 830.3, 1208, 1275, 2053.1, 6027, 7442, 11165.15, 13701, and 16970 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 215, 2574, 6325, 9702, and 9730 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 3600) of Part 8 of Division 4 of, the Probate Code, to amend Section 20133 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 6217.6, 25722.8, and 30620 of, and to amend and renumber Section 6717.6.1 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 379.8, 589, 740.5, 741, 747.6, 769, 984.5, 987, 2120, 2827.10, 4661, 100602.4, and 170056 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 62, 2615.6, 17053.57, 18796, 19136, 19164, and 19555 of, and to amend and renumber Section 20125 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 1653.5, 2810.2, 12801, 12801.9, 14601.2, 15210, 15215, 21251, 21260, and 27375 of, and to amend and renumber the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 21250) of Chapter 1 of Division 11 of, the Vehicle Code, to amend Sections 304.7, 355, 366.31, 726, 4363, 4512, 4571, 4685.8, 5848.5, 6604.9, 8103, 11400, 11450.025, 14005.30, 14005.65, 14007.1, 14132.277, 14182.18, 14186.1, 14186.36, 14701, 17603, 17604, 17606.10, 17612.3, 17612.5, 17613.2, 17613.3, 17613.4, 18259.7, and 18901 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Section 2 of Chapter 489 of the Statutes of 2001, to amend Section 34 of Chapter 37 of the Statutes of 2013, to amend Sections 1 and 5 of Chapter 391 of the Statutes of 2013, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 653 of the Statutes of 2013, relating to the maintenance of the codes.
Title
Maintenance of the codes.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1304 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1304 Committee on Jud. (Evans) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1304 Committee on Jud. (Evans) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected June 24.) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3403.) (May 6). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |