CA SB1304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2713.1 of the Penal Code, relating to prisons.
Title
Prisons: release allowance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1304 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Kamlager (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Kamlager (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3970.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3791.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3184.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2713.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |