CA SB1308 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41985.5 and 41986 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Ozone: indoor air cleaning devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1308 Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4013.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3467.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 41985.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 41986 | Amended Code | Citation Text |