CA SB1323 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1001.36, 1368, 1369, 1370, and 1370.1 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 4361 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: competence to stand trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1323 Menjivar Senate Third Reading By Hart (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1323 Menjivar et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1323 Menjivar et al (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1323 Menjivar et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1323 Menjivar et al (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4176.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3979.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3534.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1369 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |