CA SB133 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6219 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 367.75 of, to add Sections 367.8 and 367.10 to, and to add and repeal Section 367.76 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 68933, 69894, 70602.6, and 70662 of, to amend and repeal Sections 70616, 70617, 70657, and 70677 of, and to add Chapter 2.2 (commencing with Section 68655) to Title 8 of, the Government Code, to add Section 1473.1 to the Penal Code, and to add and repeal Section 679.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - SB 133 Budget and Fiscal Review Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB133 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB133 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB133 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB133 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1774.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 2409.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2370.) |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rules Suspended. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 496.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.76 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68933 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69894 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70602.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70616 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70617 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70657 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70677 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1473.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 679.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |