CA SB1335 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 501, 502, 502.1, 502.3, 503, 504, 505, 506, 507, 508, 510, 511.5, 512, 513, 514, 515, 516, 520, and 520.1 of, to add Sections 500.2, 502.4, and 522 to, to repeal Sections 502.5 and 516.1 of, and to repeal and add Sections 500, 500.1, 502.2, 517, 518, and 519 of, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the California Cadet Corps.
Title
The California Cadet Corps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1335 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1335 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1335 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4014.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3512.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |