CA SB1339 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14043.38 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: Drug Medi-Cal Treatment Program providers.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1339 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1339 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1339 Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1339 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1339 Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4645.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6193.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3659.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14043.38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |