CA SB1348 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 66076) to Chapter 2 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: Designation of California Black-Serving Institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Bradford et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Bradford et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4192.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66076 | New Code | See Bill Text |