CA SB1352 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1771.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to continuing care retirement communities.
Title
Continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Tina McKinnor [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Senate - Special Consent SB1352 Wahab et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Assembly - SB 1352 Wahab Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1352 Wahab (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Assembly - SB 1352 Wahab Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1352 Wahab (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3894.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | April 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 15). |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1771.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |