CA SB1356 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 314, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 314, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.64 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1356 De Le (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1356 De Leon Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1356 Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1356 De Leon Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1356 Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 314, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4807.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6368.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6130.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3235.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17801 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17802 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 3496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.64 | New Code | See Bill Text |