CA SB1358 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3521.7 of the Government Code, relating to collective bargaining.
Title
Collective bargaining: state employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-13 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3521.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |