CA SB1358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 519, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 519, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1701.1, 1701.2, 1701.3, and 1701.4 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: proceedings: hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1358 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1358 Hueso Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1358 Hueso Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 519, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6960.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Quirk. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1701.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |