CA SB136 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1704 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: brokers and agents: notice of appointment.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_136&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_136_bill_20130128_introduced.html |