CA SB1390 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 19750) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 336.9 and 337a of the Penal Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling: sports wagering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1390 Wright (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1390 Wright (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-07 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3263.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-04-05 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-03-21 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19750 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19868 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 336.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |