CA SB1411 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 528.5 to the Penal Code, relating to impersonation.
Title
Impersonation: Internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1411 Simitian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent #25 SB1411 Simitian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent #25 SB1411 Simitian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6181.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |
2010-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3706.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-26 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3305.) | |
2010-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3166.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-06 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-04-05 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-23 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2010-03-11 | To Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |