CA SB1428 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1702 to the Civil Code, relating to contracts.
Title
Contracts: automatic renewal provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1428 Hernandez (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4062.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (May 3). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1683 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1702 | New Code | See Bill Text |