CA SB1429 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41422 and 46392 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: emergencies: snowstorms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1429 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1429 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3576.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3378.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41422 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |