CA SB1432 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Vetoed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 130060, 130063, 130065, and 130066.5 of, and to add Sections 130065.2, 130065.3, and 130065.35 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: seismic standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1432 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1432 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1432 Caballero et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1432 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1432 Caballero et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2024-09-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 6730.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | (Corrected August 21.) |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4139.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3983.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3756.) (April 24). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130063 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130066.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |