CA SB1439 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 87604.5, 89521, and 92612.1 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: academic and administrative employees: disclosure of sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1439 Block Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1439 Block Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1439 Block (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1439 Block Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1439 Block (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5897.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4143.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3418.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87604.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 87607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89521 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 92612.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |